skip to content

Teschke, Susan Reilly

CPSO#: 90342

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K7
Phone: 2896395532
Fax: (905) 545-6793 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Centre for Family Medicine
10 B Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2G 1C5
Canada
Phone: (519) 783-0020
Fax: (519) 783-0031
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

248 Argyle St. South
Hamilton ON  N3W 1K7
Canada
Phone: (289) 757-2287
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN REILLY TESCHKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESCHKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 09 Apr 2009 to 06 May 2009
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2011 to 20 Nov 2011
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2013