skip to content

Terpstra, Collin Rudy

CPSO#: 86587

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
1730 Bishop Street North
Cambridge ON  N1T 1N4
Phone: (519) 578-1500
Fax: (519) 800-3732 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Collin Terpstra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Terpstra ( CPSO# 86587 )

Business Address:
Unit 1A
1730 Bishop Street North
Cambridge ON  N1T 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 578-1500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:20 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COLLIN RUDY TERPSTRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERPSTRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011