skip to content

Terlecki, Magdalena Maria

CPSO#: 100809

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Sep 2019
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 17 Sep 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lublin, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
Department of Anesthsia and
Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5 Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAGDALENA MARIA TERLECKI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TERLECKI is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. TERLECKI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TERLECKI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. TERLECKI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TERLECKI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TERLECKI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2020.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2019