skip to content

Teriaky, Anouar

CPSO#: 91021

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C4-211C
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: 519-663-3165
Fax: 519-663-3858 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anouar Teriaky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Teriaky ( CPSO# 91021 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANOUAR TERIAKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERIAKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013