skip to content

Tepperman, Perry Sheldon

CPSO#: 26538

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 07 Jan 2020
EXPIRY DATE
07 Jan 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jun 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Perry S. Tepperman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 7 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: DOCUdavit Solutions 28 Eugene St Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tele:1 -888-781-9083
Date Received: 07 Jan 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:28 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jan 2020