skip to content

Tepperman, Elissa Dawn

CPSO#: 98471

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J3
Phone: 5197538666
Fax: 5197533109 Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELISSA DAWN TEPPERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEPPERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017