skip to content

Tepperman, Barry Steven

CPSO#: 28437

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 May 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 May 1983

Summary

Date of Death: 17-May-2007

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 09 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 May 1983