skip to content

Tennankore, Karthik Kannan

CPSO#: 90343

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 09 Apr 2009 to 04 May 2009
EL - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2013