skip to content

Tenbergen, Melissa Marie

CPSO#: 98071

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
104-25 Elm St
St Thomas ON  N5R 1H5
Phone: 226-210-3773
Fax: 519-914-0122 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southwest Public Health
1230 Talbot St
St Thomas ON  N5P 1G9
Canada
Phone: 519-631-9900
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M. Tenbergen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tenbergen ( CPSO# 98071 )

Business Address:
Southwest Publich Health
1230 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 631-9900

Business Address:
104 - 25 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1H5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELISSA MARIE TENBERGEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TENBERGEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2014