skip to content

Temple, Sara Jane

CPSO#: 88945

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
531 Davis Drive
Suite 208
Newmarket ON  L3Y6P5
Phone: 905-953-8838
Fax: 905-953-8521 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sara Temple Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Temple ( CPSO# 88945 )

Business Address:
Suite 207
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 953-8838

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARA JANE TEMPLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEMPLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 24 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 11 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2014