skip to content

Teichman, Joshua Cary

CPSO#: 88669

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prism Eye Institute
Suite 100
2201 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 0J8
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Fax: (905) 820-0111 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prism Eye Institute
Unit 605, 7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Fax: (905) 456-5085
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Suite 600, 340 College St
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

TLC Mississauga
Suite 200
2201 Bristol Circle
Mississauga ON  L6H 0J8
Canada
Phone: 1 877-852-2020
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Joshua C. Teichman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Teichman ( CPSO# 88669 )

Business Address:
600-340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Business Address:
100, 200 - 2201 Bristol Circle
Oakville ON  L6H 0J8
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
605-7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSHUA CARY TEICHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEICHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013