skip to content

Teague, Paul Edward Robert

CPSO#: 19937

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 245 Pelham Rd St Catharines ON L2S 1X8
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Oct 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018