skip to content

Tbakhi, Abdelghani Issa A

CPSO#: 85950

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 14 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Jordan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KHCC
202 Queen Rania Al Abdulla St
Amman 11941
Jordan
Phone: 96265300460 Ext. 5252
Fax: 96265342567

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Tbakhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tbakhi ( CPSO# 85950 )

Business Address:
No business address available


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Jordan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:14 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Dec 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2009 Active
             Dr. Abdelghani Issa A. Tbakhi may practise medicine independently in Pathology,
            only.