skip to content

Tazkarji, Mohammad Bachir

CPSO#: 86022

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Mar 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Aleppo, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7Th Floor
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-9900
Fax: (905) 272-9977 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3012
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.B. Tazkarji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016
Corporation Name: M. Bachir Tazkarji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tazkarji ( CPSO# 86022 )

Business Address:
Suite 700
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9900

Business Address:
Toronto Rehab Insititute
5th Floor
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3012

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD BACHIR TAZKARJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAZKARJI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2020