skip to content

Tayyari, Farnoosh

CPSO#: 95208

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Farnoosh Tayyari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tayyari ( CPSO# 95208 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FARNOOSH TAYYARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYYARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
AVP - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 May 2017
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2016