skip to content

Taylor-Wall, Suzanne Eva Maria

CPSO#: 88374

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Taylor, Suzanne Eva Maria (used until: 03 Apr 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone: (519) 642-2077
Fax: (519) 642-1725 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Taylor-Wall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Taylor-Wall ( CPSO# 88374 )

Business Address:
Unit 1
1261 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0G6
Phone Number: (519) 642-2077

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUZANNE EVA MARIA TAYLOR-WALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR-WALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011