skip to content

Taylor, Taryn Suzanne Marie

CPSO#: 93806

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital - B2-413
800 Commissioners Rd East
N6A 5W9
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 519 646 6098
Fax: 519 646 6180 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Taryn S.M. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Taylor ( CPSO# 93806 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B2 - 461
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6098

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TARYN SUZANNE MARIE TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016