skip to content

Taylor, Robin Sarah Lynne

CPSO#: 88455

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Public Health
100 Constellation Drive
Ottawa ON  K2G 6J8
Phone: (613) 580-6744 Ext. 23684 Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:15 Jul 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBIN SARAH LYNNE TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2015