skip to content

Taylor, Pamela Lea

CPSO#: 88413

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Southampton, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whitby Medical Arts Building
Suite 204
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (289) 240-7962
Fax: (289) 240-7964 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Whitby Medical Arts Building
1615 Dundas St E.
Unit 16
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Canada
Phone: 905-245-0477
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

59 Hayden Street
7th Floor
Toronto ON  M4Y 2P2
Canada
Phone: 647-343-0207
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Pamela Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Taylor ( CPSO# 88413 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
1615 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (289) 240-7962

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAMELA LEA TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
International Specialist Physician - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009