skip to content

Taylor, Michael James

CPSO#: 17296

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 21 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1959
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 May 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2011