skip to content

Taylor, James

CPSO#: 88364

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 May 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 King St W
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Hematology
Burr 2
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 544-2631 Ext. 6694
Fax: (613) 546-8201 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 28 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Vancouver General Hospital, Floor 10, Leukemia BMT Program of BC, 2775 Laurel Street, Vancouver, BC V5Z 1M9
Date Received: 25 May 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2019