skip to content

Taylor, Hallie Ann

CPSO#: 94048

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Max Rady College of Medicine, University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: 5199412410 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

2 Thompson Crescent Unit. 3
Erin ON  N0B1T0
Canada
Phone: 519-833-0000
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Muneesh Jha Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jha ( CPSO# 92388 )
Dr. H. Taylor ( CPSO# 94048 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
10 Lower Jarvis
Toronto ON  M5E 1Z2
Phone Number: (647) 827-9200

Business Address:
222 Lansdowne Avenue
Toronto ON  M6K 3C6


Corporation Name: Hallie Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jha ( CPSO# 92388 )
Dr. H. Taylor ( CPSO# 94048 )

Business Address:
2 Thompson Cres
Unit 3
Erin ON  N0B 1T0
Phone Number: 5198330000

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HALLIE ANN TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011