skip to content

Taylor, Gerald Melvin James

CPSO#: 26536

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
27 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1263 Canford Crescent
Mississauga ON  L5J 3M9
Phone: (905) 823-3615
Fax: (905) 823-9995 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gerald M. J. Taylor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Taylor ( CPSO# 26536 )

Business Address:
1263 Canford Crescent
Mississauga ON  L5J 3M9
Phone Number: (905) 823-3615

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 2021