skip to content

Taylor, Allan James

CPSO#: 89375

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of National Defence
101 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: (613)9019906 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

PSFDH
60 Cornelia St W.
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
Phone: 6132832330
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

PSFDH GWM
33 Drummond ST W
Perth ON  K7H2K1
Canada
Phone: 6132671500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

Queensway Carleton Hospital
John Sutherland Drive
Nepean ON  K2H8P4
Canada
Phone: 6137212000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Kemptville District Hospital
2671 Concession Rd
Kemptville ON  K0G1J0
Canada
Phone: 6132580100
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLAN JAMES TAYLOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYLOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011