skip to content

Tayeb, Sarah Abdulsalam Mohammad

CPSO#: 94565

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Apr 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 07 Jan 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 08 Jan 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2014 to 04 Apr 2014
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2014