skip to content

Tayag, Christel M

CPSO#: 84836

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Feb 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:Angeles University Foundatio, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 113
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: (519) 946-0246
Fax: (519) 258-2169 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christel Tayag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tayag ( CPSO# 84836 )

Business Address:
Unit 113
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 946-0246

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTEL M TAYAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAYAG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2009