skip to content

Tawfic Hamodi, Qutaiba Amir

CPSO#: 97749

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Oct 2014
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Al-Nahrain University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Science Centre
Department of Anesthesiology
339 Windermere Rd
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 6858500 Ext. 61786
Fax: (519) 646-6219 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

268 Grosvenor Street
B3-Pain Clinic
London ON  N6A4V2
Canada
Phone: 519 646-6100 Ext. 61786
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tawfic Hamodi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Tawfic Hamodi ( CPSO# 97749 )

Business Address:
London Health Science Centre
Department of Anesthesiology
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Iraq

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Oct 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Feb 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2020 Active
 1.    Dr. Qutaiba Amir Tawfic Hamodi may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anesthesia and Perioperative Medicine, Schulich School of Medicine
                        and Dentistry, in which Dr. Tawfic Hamodi holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Tawfic Hamodi no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Tawfic Hamodi's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Tawfic Hamodi's
                        certificate of registration, following consideration of the
                        practice assessment report.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on October 1, 2014, and expires on June 30,
                  2021.  Upon renewal of Dr. Tawfic Hamodi's academic appointment at the
                  Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, the expiry date can be
                  extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.