skip to content

Tavernier, Joseph

CPSO#: 31231

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Nov 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dartmouth Medical School, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. E. Tavernier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: 883 Victoria Street Midland, Ontario L4R 1B7
Date Received: 12 Aug 2020


Address: Paitents seeking a copy of their medical records can do so by contacting: Tel: 705-526-3338
Date Received: 15 Mar 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Aug 2020