skip to content

Tasker, John James

CPSO#: 24037

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 30 Oct 1997
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Oct 1997