skip to content

Tasharofi Kia, Mina

CPSO#: 86443

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lemore Clinic
4800 Leslie st, unit 402
North York ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416)446-5965
Fax: (855)546-3540 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mina Tasharofi Kia Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tasharofi Kia ( CPSO# 86443 )

Business Address:
Lemore Clinic
402 - 4800 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 446-5965

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MINA TASHAROFI KIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TASHAROFI KIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009