skip to content

Tarulli, Emidio

CPSO#: 98475

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
76 Stuart Street
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 6135482473 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: E Tarulli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tarulli ( CPSO# 98475 )

Business Address:
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMIDIO TARULLI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARULLI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017