Tarola, Christopher Louis (CPSO#: 100887)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Department of Cardiac Surgery
6th Floor
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 32271
Electoral District: 02

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER LOUIS TAROLA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TAROLA is enrolled at THE UNIVERSITY OF WESTERN ONTARIO;

(2) Dr. TAROLA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TAROLA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. TAROLA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TAROLA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TAROLA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019