skip to content

Tarlton, Rebecca Susan

CPSO#: 32226

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jan 1984
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Clinical Immunology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jan 1984