skip to content

Tariq, Marium

CPSO#: 94347

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
363 Colborne St
Brantford ON  N3S 3N2
Phone: (519) 754-0777
Fax: 519-754-0757 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Marium Tariq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tariq ( CPSO# 94347 )

Business Address:
363 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3S 3N2
Phone Number: (519) 754-0777


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARIUM TARIQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARIQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 29 Aug 2010 to 25 Sep 2010
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011