skip to content

Targonsky, Elisha David

CPSO#: 90705

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rm 1NW- 126
North York General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6000
Fax: 416-756-6151 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital Site
Dept of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M2N1
Canada
Phone: 905-813-1100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Targonsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Targonsky ( CPSO# 90705 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
Room 1NE-126
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Haliburton Site Haliburton
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELISHA DAVID TARGONSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TARGONSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2012