skip to content

Tao, Yi Man Eva

CPSO#: 95802

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taddlecreek Family Health Team
790 Bay St. Suite 302
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 585-9555
Fax: (416) 585-5815 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

17 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M4M 3H9
Canada
Phone: 4164656606
Fax: 4164656609
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Fan & Tao Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fan ( CPSO# 95154 )
Dr. Y. Tao ( CPSO# 95802 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
9th Floor Stroke Rehab
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
17 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M4M 3H9
Phone Number: (416) 465-6606

Business Address:
302 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 585-9555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YI MAN EVA TAO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013