skip to content

Tanner, John Robert

CPSO#: 20809

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jun 1986
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 1969
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1986