Zakhem, Tania Lee (CPSO#: 92844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone: (613) 258-0100
Fax: (613) 258-6171
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tania Zakhem Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Zakhem ( CPSO# 92844 )

Business Address:
Kemptville District Hospital
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Business Address:
90 Royal Landing Gate
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-0100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANIA LEE ZAKHEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAKHEM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012