skip to content

Tang, Patrick Hsin-Peng

CPSO#: 86379

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75621
Fax: (905) 524-5707 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

435 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C2
Canada
Phone: 519-575-4400 Ext. 3029
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

381 Finkle St
Woodstock ON  N4V 1A3
Canada
Phone: 519-777-3678
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

66 Pinebush Rd
Cambridge ON  N1R 8K5
Canada
Phone: 519-654-2134
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

365 West St
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Canada
Phone: 519-426-6170
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

1565 Upper James St
Hamilton ON  L9B 1K2
Canada
Phone: 905-667-4848
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PATRICK HSIN-PENG TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012