skip to content

Tang, Lan

CPSO#: 94364

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Hubei Medical College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 57
10909 Yonge St.
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3E3
Phone: 905-237-6697
Fax: 905-237-7987 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lan Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tang ( CPSO# 94364 )

Business Address:
Unit 57
10909 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3E3
Phone Number: (905) 237-6697

Medical Records Location

Address: Unimedico Family Practice Unit 110 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West Vaughan, ON L6A 4P9 Tel: 289 553 3300 Fax: 289 553 2600
Instructions: Patients who were treated at Unimedico Family Practice may contact this clinic for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 11 Dec 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Jan 2015 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jun 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Jun 2013 Active
             Dr. Lan Tang may practise medicine independently in family medicine, only.