skip to content

Tang, Ephraim Shin-Tian

CPSO#: 95587

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Multi-Organ transplant Program
University Hospital, LHSC
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2904
Fax: (519) 663-3858 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Ephraim S. Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tang ( CPSO# 95587 )

Business Address:
756 Headley Drive
London ON  N6H V8
Phone Number: 226-503-1204

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EPHRAIM SHIN-TIAN TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - General Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016