skip to content

Tang, Anthony Sze-Leung

CPSO#: 30099

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
Room C6 116
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3746
Fax: (519) 663-3782 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Anthony Tang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tang ( CPSO# 30099 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
Room C6-109
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3746

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:02 Dec 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANTHONY SZE-LEUNG TANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2013

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 22, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)