skip to content

Tan, Thuang Kim

CPSO#: 25571

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. T.K. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request c/o Dr. Leon Bhatia to: 855 Broadview Ave. Suite 405, Toronto ON, M4K 3Z1 or via telephone at (416) 967-9220 or via Fax: (416) 967-9276
Date Received: 24 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019