skip to content

Tan, Romeo Banzon

CPSO#: 91994

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 05 Aug 2021
EXPIRY DATE
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:Far Eastern University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2021
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 05 Aug 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2020 Active
 As from October 14, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Romeo Banzon Tan in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Tan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")
of
DR. ROMEO BANZON TAN  
("Dr. Tan")
to 
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE
(1)	In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 
"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
(2)	I, Dr. Tan, certificate of registration number 91994, am a member of the College.  
(3)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge that the College conducted investigations bearing File Numbers 1112015 and 1111702 (the "Investigations") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family medicine practice
B.	UNDERTAKING
(4)	I, Dr. Tan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(5)	Professional Education  
(a)	I, Dr. Tan, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):
(i)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies:            
1.	Boundary Violations, College policy; and
2.	Maintaining Appropriate Boundaries and Preventing Sexual Abuse, College policy attached at Appendix "B" to this Undertaking (see Appendix "B"). 
(ii)	individualized coaching, as outlined in the IEP attached at Appendix "A", satisfactory to the College, with a coach selected by the College.
(b)	I, Dr. Tan, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and/or participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(c)	I, Dr. Tan, undertake to complete this requirement by six (6) months, or, if no satisfactory program is available by that time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
(d)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
(e)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
(6)	Monitoring 
(a)	I, Dr. Tan, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
(b)	I, Dr. Tan, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(7)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(8)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(9)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(10)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").
(11)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.
(12)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
(13)	Public Register
(a)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
The College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Tan engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his family medicine practice. As a result of the investigations, Dr. Tan will engage in professional education including with respect to examination techniques, gowning, and appropriate communications. 
(c)	I, Dr. Tan, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied. 
D.	CONSENT
(14)	I, Dr. Tan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:
(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 
(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(15)	I, Dr. Tan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(16)	I, Dr. Tan, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;  
(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.



Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Jun 2021
Summary:

On November 21, 2018, allegations of Dr. Tan’s professional misconduct were referred 
to the Discipline Committee of the College. It was alleged that Dr. Tan engaged in 
sexual abuse of a patient, and engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
conduct.  
 
The matter was heard on February 3-6, 2020 in person, in the presence of counsel for 
the College, Dr. Tan and counsel for Dr. Tan. The Committee reserved decision.  
 
On June 2, 2021, the Committee released its order and reasons finding that Dr. Tan 
committed an act of professional misconduct: 
 
   -  under clause 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code which is 
      schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18 (the 
      “Code”) in that he engaged in sexual abuse of a patient; and 
       
   -  under paragraph 1(1)33 of Ontario Regulation 856/93, in that he has engaged in 
      an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all 
      the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
      dishonourable or unprofessional. 
 
Specifically, the Committee found that Dr. Tan committed sexual abuse of the patient by 
touching her genitals in a sexual manner and by making remarks of a sexual nature 
towards her in an appointment in 2014; and that Dr. Tan engaged in an act or omission 
relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional 
both with respect to his touching of the patient and/or his remarks in an appointment in 
2014; and by failing to provide privacy, gown or drape before conducting a complete 
physical examination of the patient. 

Reasons for the decision on liability are available on the CPSO’s website and on CanLII 
at College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario v. Tan, 2021 ONCPSD 25. 

Disposition 
The Committee held a penalty hearing on August 5, 2021. The Committee’s order, 
issued that day, provided: 

   -  Dr. Tan is to attend before the panel to be reprimanded within thirty (30) days of 
      the date of this Order; 
   -  the Registrar is to revoke Dr. Tan’s certificate of registration effective 
     immediately. 
  -  the Registrar is to place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. 
     Tan’s certificate of registration, effective immediately: Dr. Tan shall comply with 
     the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”. 
   -  Dr. Tan is to reimburse the College for funding provided to the patient under the 
       program required under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter 
       of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within thirty (30) days of this 
       Order in the amount of $17,370. 
    -  Dr. Tan is to pay the College costs in the amount of $43,110 by September 6, 
       2021. 
        
 Reasons for the decision on penalty, issued September 10, 2021, are available on CanLII 
 at College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario v. Tan, 2021 ONPSDT 39, and on 
 the CPSO’s website.  
 On September 2, 2021 Dr. Tan appealed the Discipline Committee’s June 2 decision on 
 finding and August 5 decision on penalty to the Divisional Court. Pursuant to section 71 
of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health 
Professions Act, 1991, SO 1991, c. 18, an order made by a panel of the Discipline 
 Committee directing the Registrar to revoke a member’s certificate of registration takes 
 effect immediately, despite any appeal, where the Committee found that the member 
 committed sexual abuse.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Hearing: February 3-6, 2020 Penalty Hearing: August 5, 2021

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: August 5, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
As from August 5, 2021, by order of the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Romeo Banzon Tan:

a. Dr. Tan shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”.

 

Source: Other
Active Date: April 24, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CRIMINAL CHARGES

Dr. Romeo Tan was charged with the following offence:

(1) Sexual assault on or about May 5, 2014, at the City of Toronto, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charges: April 24, 2019
Place of charges: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Service

 

Source: Other
Active Date: April 24, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS

On April 24, 2019, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Dr. Romeo Tan:

1. Notify specified officer within 24 hours of any change in his address, employment or occupation.

2. Abstain from contacting and/or communicating directly or indirectly with specified person by any physical, electronic or other means, or from going to within 100 metres of anywhere specified person is known to live, work, go to school or happens to be, with certain specified exception.

3. While in the course of his medical employment, he is not to be in the presence of any female patient except in the presence of specified persons or a member of a regulated health profession who is instructed to monitor any physical examination.

4. Not to possess any weapons, as defined by the Criminal Code of Canada.