skip to content

Tan, Nigel Shih-Yen

CPSO#: 95782

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Ormond St S
Thorold ON  L2V 1X9
Phone: 905-935-0312
Fax: 905-935-2949 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nigel S. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tan ( CPSO# 95782 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2

Business Address:
464 Welland Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2M 5V4
Phone Number: (905) 935-0312

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Windsor Regional Cancer Centre Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NIGEL SHIH-YEN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015