skip to content

Tan, Lih Yeen

CPSO#: 95111

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite M4
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 100
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 231-4100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. L. Y. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tan ( CPSO# 95111 )

Business Address:
56 Aberfoyle Cres
Suite 100
Etobicoke ON  M8X 2W4


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LIH YEEN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 17 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016