skip to content

Tan, Lee Puan

CPSO#: 22995

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. P. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 1407 Ottawa Street Windsor, ON N8X 2G1
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015