skip to content

Tan, Kim-Weng

CPSO#: 24005

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Aug 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services 111 St. Regis Street South North York ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 25 Jan 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIM-WENG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1970