skip to content

Tan, Eva Yunru

CPSO#: 98733

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
Emergency Department
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: 905-472-7000
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Seneca Health Centre
1750 Finch Avenue East
Room G2652
Toronto ON  M2J2X5
Canada
Phone: 416-491-5050
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eva Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tan ( CPSO# 98733 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3050 Birchmound Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Emergency Department
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Seneca Health Centre
Room G2652
1750 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 2X5
Phone Number: (416) 491-5050

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 04 Nov 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EVA YUNRU TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2015