skip to content

Tan, Adrian Chong Beng

CPSO#: 96599

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Singapore, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2012